Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Marusci (Maruschian)

Deceased

Archbishop of Constantinople (Istanbul) (Armenian)

Note/Previous Titular See: (coad/Abp Baghinanti)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1776BornAncyra
13 Sep 182549.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mactaris
14 Aug 183256.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop
14 Aug 183256.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Chalcis in Syria
19 Aug 183256.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chalcis in Syria
3 Apr 183861.8AppointedArchbishop of Constantinople (Istanbul) (Armenian), Turkey
2 Aug 184670.2DiedArchbishop of Constantinople (Istanbul) (Armenian), Turkey

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Paolo Marusci (Maruschian)
Archbishop Paolo Marusci (Maruschian) (born , died ) Archbishop of Constantinople (Istanbul)

  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 147, and Page 162
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 249
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 Jul 2016