Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Vespasiani

Deceased

Bishop of Fano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1812BornRoma
18 Apr 183522.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 185644.4AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
4 Jan 185744.5Ordained BishopBishop of Fano, Italy
19 Mar 185744.7InstalledBishop of Fano, Italy
7 Oct 187765.2DiedBishop of Fano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Vespasiani:
Bishop Filippo Vespasiani (born , died ) Bishop of Fano

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 268
  • c34: CB, 18 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014