Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Bellé

Deceased

Bishop of Mantova, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1777Born
28 Feb 180123.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Feb 183557.3SelectedBishop of Mantova, Italy
24 Jul 183557.8ConfirmedBishop of Mantova, Italy
26 Jul 183557.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mantova, Italy
30 Jun 184466.7DiedBishop of Mantova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Bellé (VIAF: 89113456)
Bishop Giovanni Battista Bellé (born , died ) Bishop of Mantova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLodi, Diocese of Lodi

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 251
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,835, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast