Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Shanley

Deceased

Bishop of Fargo, North Dakota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1852Born
30 May 187422.4Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 188937.9AppointedBishop of Jamestown, North Dakota, USA
27 Dec 188937.9Ordained BishopBishop of Jamestown, North Dakota, USA
16 Jul 190957.5DiedBishop of Fargo, North Dakota, USA

MicroData Summary for John Shanley (VIAF: 31161363)
Bishop John Shanley (born , died ) Bishop of Fargo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlbion, NY, Diocese of Buffalo, New York
Ordained BishopSt. Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul, Minnesota

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 268, and Page 315
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017