Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paolo Cardinal Polidori

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Council

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede

Titular Archbishop of Tarsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1778BornIesi, Italy
1800²21.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 183456.4Elevated to Cardinal
1 Aug 183456.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
21 Nov 183456.8AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Regular Discipline
27 Jul 184062.5AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation of the Council
12 Jul 184163.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
15 Sep 184163.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
22 Jan 184466.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
11 Feb 184466.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
23 Apr 184769.3DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Polidori (VIAF: 89064103)
Paolo Cardinal Polidori (born , died ) Prefect of Council

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
  • a cardinal for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 360
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 10
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Jun 1834

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016