Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Covarrubias y Mejía

Deceased

Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1826Born
27 Jan 183913.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 186135.5AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
28 Jul 186135.5Ordained BishopBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
23 Mar 186539.1InstalledBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
5 Dec 186741.8DiedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for José María Covarrubias y Mejía (VIAF: 88980767)
Bishop José María Covarrubias y Mejía (born , died ) Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuerétaro
Ordained BishopSant’Apollinare, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 28.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 105
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1861, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast