Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lawrence Stephen McMahon

Deceased

Bishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1835Born
24 Mar 186024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
16 Feb 187236.1IncardinatedPriest of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
16 May 187943.3AppointedBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
10 Aug 187943.6Ordained BishopBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
21 Aug 189357.6DiedBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Stephen McMahon
Bishop Lawrence Stephen McMahon (born , died ) Bishop of Hartford

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. John, New Brunswick, Archdiocese of Québec, Canada
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Cathedral, Hartford, Diocese of Hartford, Connecticut
Death PlaceLakeville, CT, Diocese of Hartford, Connecticut

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 300
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast