Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Andrea Grande

Deceased

Archbishop of Otranto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1785Born
19 Dec 180722.8Ordained PriestPriest
4 Oct 183348.6SelectedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
20 Jan 183448.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
26 Jan 183448.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
13 Feb 187185.9DiedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Andrea Grande
Archbishop Vincenzo Andrea Grande (born , died ) Archbishop of Otranto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLecce

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 217
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,834, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast