Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Giacinto Luigi Maria Fantini

Deceased

Bishop of Fossano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1803BornChieri
20 May 182622.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 184945.7SelectedBishop of Fossano, Italy
28 Sep 184945.9ConfirmedBishop of Fossano, Italy
21 Oct 184946.0Ordained BishopBishop of Fossano, Italy
28 Aug 185248.8DiedBishop of Fossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Giacinto Luigi Maria Fantini:
Bishop Carlo Giacinto Luigi Maria Fantini (born , died ) Bishop of Fossano

  • a priest for 26.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 276

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013