Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolaus Ferrarelli

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Myra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1762BornRoma, Italy
11 Apr 178926.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 Sep 183169.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Maronea
13 Nov 183169.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maronea
1 Feb 183673.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Myra
28 Nov 184381.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Myra

MicroData Summary for Nicolaus Ferrarelli:
Archbishop Nicolaus Ferrarelli (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Myra

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 254, and Page 274

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013