Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martino Caliendi

Deceased

Bishop of Montefeltro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1787Born
22 Sep 181023.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 184254.8AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
17 Apr 184255.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
21 Apr 184558.0AppointedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
Apr 1849³62.0DiedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martino Caliendi (VIAF: 88844824)
Bishop Martino Caliendi (born , died Apr 1849) Bishop of Montefeltro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScavolino
Ordained BishopSan Francesco di Sales al Quirinale, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 193, and Page 324
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast