Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Maria Perrone, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gerace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1782BornCusentin
31 May 180624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
22 Feb 183451.7SelectedBishop of Gerace, Italy
19 Dec 183452.5ConfirmedBishop of Gerace, Italy
28 Dec 183452.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gerace, Italy
14 Mar 185269.8DiedBishop of Gerace, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Maria Perrone:
Bishop Luigi Maria Perrone C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Gerace

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 213

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013