Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eugenio Cecconi

Deceased

Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1834Born
4 Sep 185925.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Sep 185925.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 187440.8AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
3 Jan 187540.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
15 Jun 188854.3DiedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Cecconi (VIAF: 18098819)
Archbishop Eugenio Cecconi (born , died ) Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopS. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 28.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 272
  • ob/c2+: CB, 20 Sep 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017