Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Filippo Gallo, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bovino

Titular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1806BornTrentola
19 Sep 182923.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
18 Mar 185246.0AppointedBishop of Bovino, Italy
28 Mar 185246.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bovino, Italy
9 Mar 185852.0ResignedBishop of Bovino, Italy
18 Mar 185852.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
27 Jan 189083.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Bovino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Gallo:
Archbishop Filippo Gallo C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bovino

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1888
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 155, and Page 444

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013