Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Giuseppe Mirone

Deceased

Bishop of Noto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1789BornCatania
3 Apr 181324.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 184050.9SelectedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
27 Apr 184051.2ConfirmedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
25 Jul 184051.4Ordained BishopBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
26 May 185364.2SelectedBishop of Noto, Italy
27 Jun 185364.3ConfirmedBishop of Noto, Italy
17 Feb 186475.0DiedBishop of Noto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Giuseppe Mirone:
Bishop Mario Giuseppe Mirone (born , died ) Bishop of Noto

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 410
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 388

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013