Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurice Francis Burke

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1845Born
22 May 187530.0Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
9 Aug 188742.2AppointedBishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA
28 Oct 188742.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA
19 Jun 189348.1AppointedBishop of Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
17 Mar 192377.8DiedBishop of Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for Maurice Francis Burke
Bishop Maurice Francis Burke (born , died ) Bishop of Saint Joseph

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKnockainy, Archdiocese of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
Ordained BishopHoly Name, Cathedral, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 199, and Page 324
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017