Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Samuel Foley

Deceased

Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1833Born
20 Dec 185623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
3 Aug 188854.7AppointedBishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
4 Nov 188854.9Ordained BishopBishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
5 Jan 191884.1DiedBishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for John Samuel Foley
Bishop John Samuel Foley (born , died ) Bishop of Detroit

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 243
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017