Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Agazio, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trivento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1807BornSoriano Calabro
5 Aug 183224.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
19 Jun 185446.8SelectedBishop of Trivento, Italy
23 Jun 185446.8ConfirmedBishop of Trivento, Italy
30 Jul 185446.9Ordained BishopBishop of Trivento, Italy
27 Aug 185446.9InstalledBishop of Trivento, Italy
1 Feb 188779.4DiedBishop of Trivento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Agazio:
Bishop Luigi Agazio O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Trivento

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 567

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013