Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lodovico Cardinal Jacobini

Deceased

Secretary of State

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1832BornGenzano, Italy
23 Sep 185422.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 187442.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
25 Mar 187442.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
27 Mar 187442.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
19 Sep 187947.7Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 188048.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria
16 Dec 188048.9AppointedSecretary of State
27 Feb 188755.1DiedSecretary of State

MicroData Summary for Lodovico Jacobini:
Cardinal Lodovico Jacobini (born , died ) Secretary of State

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
  • a cardinal for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 550, and Page 51
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Sep 1879

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013