Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Pistoia e Prato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1777BornSigne
21 Mar 180123.8Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 183457.5AppointedBishop of Pescia, Italy
28 Dec 183457.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pescia, Italy
2 Oct 183760.3AppointedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
16 Feb 184971.7DiedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Rossi:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Rossi (born , died ) Bishop of Pistoia e Prato

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 308

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013