Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Sterlini

Deceased

Bishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1798Born
23 Mar 182224.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 184041.8SelectedBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
27 Apr 184042.1ConfirmedBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
4 Oct 184042.5Ordained BishopBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
3 Apr 186062.0DiedBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Sterlini
Bishop Nicola Sterlini (born , died ) Bishop of Calvi e Teano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGirgenti
Ordained BishopS. Andre della Valle, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 128
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1840, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast