Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giacomo Cardinal Cattani

Deceased

Archbishop of Ravenna, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1823Born
20 Sep 184522.6Ordained PriestPriest
2 May 186643.3AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Netherlands
13 Mar 186845.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
16 Mar 186845.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ancyra
12 Jul 186845.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ancyra
15 Mar 187552.1AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Council
28 Jan 187754.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
19 Sep 187956.6Elevated to Cardinal
19 Sep 187956.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
22 Sep 187956.6AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
27 Feb 188057.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
14 Feb 188764.0DiedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Cattani (VIAF: 88783239)
Giacomo Cardinal Cattani (born , died ) Archbishop of Ravenna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrisighella, Diocese of Faenza
Ordained BishopSt. John Lateran, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRavenna, Archdiocese of Ravenna
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Ravenna, Archdiocese of Ravenna

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
  • a cardinal for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 99, and Page 477
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 46
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Sep 1879
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 23
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 63, and Page 184, and Page 185
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 238

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast