Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Rozzolino

Deceased

Bishop of Caserta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1798BornNapoli
22 Sep 182123.4Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 183537.1SelectedBishop of Bova, Italy
24 Jul 183537.3ConfirmedBishop of Bova, Italy
26 Jul 183537.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bova, Italy
29 Aug 184951.4SelectedBishop of Caserta, Italy
28 Sep 184951.4ConfirmedBishop of Caserta, Italy
10 Nov 185557.6DiedBishop of Caserta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Rozzolino
Bishop Vincenzo Rozzolino (born , died ) Bishop of Caserta

  • a priest for 34.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 188
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 117
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1835, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Aug 2016