Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia}

Archidioecesis Vratislaviensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Józef Piotr Kupny, Archbishop
  • Jacek Kiciński, C.M.F., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Maciej Małyga, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Marian Gołębiewski, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 13 August 1930
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Poland
  • Square Kilometers: 8,850 (3,418 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archidiecezja.wroc.pl/
  • Mailing Address: Kuria Metropolitalna, ul. Katedralna 13, 50-328 Wroclaw, Polska
  • Telephone: (071)327.11.11
  • Fax: 322.82.69

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)
1000ErectedDiocese of Meißen (Meissen)
Diocese of Praha
Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau) (erected)
16 August 1821Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of Nordic Missions Diocese of Osnabrück
Diocese of Paderborn
Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)
17 December 1922Territory LostDiocese of Wrocław (Breslau) Apostolic Administration of Upper Silesia {Górny Sląsk} (erected)
28 October 1925Territory LostDiocese of Kielce
Diocese of Łódź
Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)
Diocese of Częstochowa (erected)
13 August 1930Territory LostDiocese of Wrocław (Breslau) Diocese of Berlin (erected)
Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia}
13 August 1930ElevatedDiocese of Wrocław (Breslau) Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia}
28 June 1972Territory LostDiocese of Berlin
Territorial Prelature of Schneidemühl (Trzcianka and Pila)
Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia}
Diocese of Gorzów (erected) (Zielona Gora)
28 June 1972Territory LostArchdiocese of Olomouc (Branice, Glubczyce, and Kietrz along with Owsiszcze)
Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia} (Gliwice, Labedy, Miechowice, Pyskowice, Toszek, Ujazd, and Zabrze (all in Katowice))
Diocese of Opole (erected)
28 June 1972Territory AddedDiocese of Meißen (Meissen) (Biedrzychowice, Bogatynia, Dzialoszyn, Krzewina, Opolno Zdrój, and Zatonie)
Archdiocese of Praha {Prague} (Bystrzyca Klodzka, Klodzko, Nowa Ruda, and Polanica Zdroj)
Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia}
28 June 1972Territory LostArchdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia} (Territory in Germany) Apostolic Administration of Görlitz (erected)
30 December 1977Territory LostArchdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia} (Tesín and Jeseník) Archdiocese of Olomouc
25 March 1992Territory LostDiocese of Częstochowa (Bolesławiec (except Skomlin), Lututów (except Naramice), Wieruszów)
Archdiocese of Gniezno (Czermin, Jarocin, Pleszew)
Diocese of Opole (Uszyce and Zdziechowice (in Gorzów Śląski))
Archdiocese of Poznań (Bralin, Kępno, Koźmin, Krotoszyn, Odolanów, Ołobok, Ostrów I, Ostrów II, Ostrzeszów)
Diocese of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze) (Błaszki, Kalisz I, Kalisz II, Koźminek, Stawiszyn, Złoczew)
Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia} (Syców (except Poniatowice), Twardogóra, along with Cieszków, Gądkowice, and Trzebicko (in Milicz))
Diocese of Kalisz (erected)
25 March 1992Territory LostArchdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia} (Bolesławiec Wschód, Bolesławiec Zachód, Chocianów, Głuszyca, Gościsław, Gryfów Śląski, Jawor, Jelenia Góra-Wschód, Jelenia Góra-Zachód, Kamienna Góra-Wschód, Kamienna Góra-Zachód, Legnica-Wschód, Legnica-Zachód, ...) Diocese of Legnica (erected)
24 February 2004Territory LostDiocese of Legnica (Bolków; Głuszyca; Goscisław; Strzegom; Świebodzice; Wałbrzych Południe; Wałbrzych Północ, Wałbrzych Zachód, and part of Jawor)
Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia} (Bystrzyca Kłodzka; Dzierżoniów Południe; Dzierżoniów Północ; Kamieniec Ząbkowicki; Kłodzko; Kudowa Zdrój; Lądek Zdrój; Międzylesie; Nowa Ruda; Polanica Zdrój; Świdnica Śląska Wschód; Świ...)
Diocese of Świdnica (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia}
19584,000,0005,300,00075.5%1,5006102,1101,8956103501,220ap1971
19802,654,0002,953,00089.9%9044361,3401,9804802,452592ap1981
19903,025,9003,117,47097.1%1,1414041,5451,9586691,878653ap1991
19991,470,1001,580,03993.0%7803251,1051,3305481,341403ap2000
20001,470,1001,580,03993.0%7773221,0991,3375211,315404ap2001
20011,470,1001,580,03993.0%7713231,0941,3435161,309407ap2002
20021,470,1001,580,00093.0%7873341,1211,3115061,308410ap2003
20031,470,1001,580,00093.0%7993351,1341,2965231,321410ap2004
20041,470,1001,580,00093.0%8143491,1631,2645201,261413ap2005
20101,152,7101,199,33296.1%6023489501,213462832300ap2011
20141,152,7101,199,33296.1%6242688921,292335839300ap2015
2017955,6051,194,50780.0%5712678381,140346795299ap2018
2020999,2141,203,87383.0%5642678311,202350668297ap2021

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 535
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 270
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 263, to Page 264
  • Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia}
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 23, Page 34, to Page 41
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 64, Page 657, to Page 659

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 13 Nov 2023