Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of North German Missions {Germania Settentrionale}

Vicariatus Apostolicus Germaniae Septentrionalis

Suppressed

To: Diocese of Osnabrück and Archdiocese of Paderborn



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Calenberg, Göttingen and Grubenhagen
28 April 1667ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Calenberg, Göttingen and Grubenhagen (erected) (territory of Minden)
Vicariate Apostolic of Calenberg, Göttingen, Grubenhagen and Halberstadt
1669Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Calenberg, Göttingen and Grubenhagen Vicariate Apostolic of Calenberg, Göttingen, Grubenhagen and Halberstadt (added territory of Halberstadt and Verden)
Vicariate Apostolic of Nordic Missions
1670Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Calenberg, Göttingen, Grubenhagen and Halberstadt Vicariate Apostolic of Nordic Missions (added Provinces of Bremen and Magdeburg)
4 May 1688Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of Nordic Missions (territory of Denmark and Sweden)
6 April 1709Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Nordic Missions Vicariate Apostolic of Upper and Lower Saxony (Hanover, Northern Germany) (erected) (territory of Minden, Verden, Halberstadt, Magdeburg, Havelberg, Brandenburg, Merseburg and Naumburg)
1743Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Nordic Missions Vicariate Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony) (erected)
11 February 1780Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of Upper and Lower Saxony (Hanover, Northern Germany) (suppressed) Vicariate Apostolic of Nordic Missions
1781Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Nordic Missions Prefecture Apostolic of Sweden (erected)
16 August 1821Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Nordic Missions Diocese of Osnabrück
Diocese of Paderborn
Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)
7 August 1868Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Nordic Missions Prefecture Apostolic of Denmark (erected)
7 August 1868Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Arctic Pole (suppressed)
Vicariate Apostolic of Nordic Missions
Vicariate Apostolic of Sweden
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Norvegia (Norway) (unknown) (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of North German Missions {Germania Settentrionale}
7 August 1868Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Nordic Missions Vicariate Apostolic of North German Missions {Germania Settentrionale}
13 August 1930SuppressedVicariate Apostolic of North German Missions {Germania Settentrionale} (suppressed) Diocese of Osnabrück
Archdiocese of Paderborn

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.2, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jul 2018

Quantcast