Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Herbert Aloysius Theodor Winkler, S.D.S. †

Deceased

Superior Emeritus of Shaowu [Shaowu], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1875Born
1904²28.2EnteredMember of Society of the Divine Savior
1 Dec 190732.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Savior
9 Jan 193054.2AppointedSuperior of Shaowu [Shaowu], China
21 May 193862.6ResignedSuperior of Shaowu [Shaowu], China
13 Jul 196791.7DiedSuperior Emeritus of Shaowu [Shaowu], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Herbert Aloysius Theodor Winkler
Father Herbert Aloysius Theodor Winkler S.D.S. (born , died ) Superior Emeritus of Shaowu [Shaowu]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTempelfield, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
Death PlaceSt. Nazianz, USA

  • a priest for 59.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast