Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Kolsdorf

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Titular Bishop of Nicopolis in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1585²Born
24 Jan 161732.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
24 Jan 161732.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Armenia
23 Apr 161732.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Armenia
9 Jul 162439.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martin Kolsdorf
Bishop Martin Kolsdorf (born 1585, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeisse
Ordained BishopAbbey Church of Stahov, Praha, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 259
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1617, Number 12
  • b/c2: CB, 18 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Jan 2017