Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Śniegoń

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Titular Bishop of Tanis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1809Born
10 Aug 183121.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
28 Nov 183223.1Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
9 Aug 188373.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
9 Aug 188373.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanis
30 Sep 188373.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanis
3 Jul 189181.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Śniegoń (VIAF: 85457780)
Bishop Franciszek Śniegoń (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTeschen
Ordained BishopTeschen

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 534
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017