Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Marx

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Titular Bishop of Colossae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1835Born
12 Jun 185823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
11 Jun 190065.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
11 Jun 190065.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Colossae
24 Jun 190065.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Colossae
25 Aug 191176.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Marx
Bishop Heinrich Marx (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzczedrzyk, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)
Ordained BishopBreslau, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 216
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 56, Number 4,113

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast