Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Paweł Albert von Sitsch

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1557¹Born
5 May 159942.3SelectedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
18 Aug 159942.6ConfirmedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
6 May 160043.3DiedBishop-Elect of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paweł Albert von Sitsch
Father Paweł Albert von Sitsch (born 1557, died ) Bishop-Elect of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRadolfzell am Bodensee

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 337
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 373
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast