Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Adolf Cardinal Bertram

Deceased

Archbishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1859Born
31 Jul 188122.3Ordained PriestPriest of Hildesheim, Germany
26 Apr 190647.1SelectedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
12 Jun 190647.2ConfirmedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
15 Aug 190647.4Ordained BishopBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
27 May 191455.2SelectedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
8 Sep 191455.4ConfirmedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
4 Dec 191657.7Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
5 Dec 191960.7Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 191960.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
13 Aug 193071.4AppointedArchbishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
6 Jul 194586.3DiedArchbishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Adolf Bertram (VIAF: 61672900)
Adolf Cardinal Bertram (born , died ) Archbishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHildesheim

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 38.8 years
  • a cardinal for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast