Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Kielce

Dioecesis Kielcensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jan Piotrowski, Bishop
  • Marian Florczyk, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Andrzej Kaleta, Auxiliary Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 28 December 1882
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Poland
  • Square Kilometers: 8,319 (3,213 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.kielce.opoka.org.pl/
  • Mailing Address: Kuria Diecezjalna, ul. Jana Pawla II, 3, 25-013 Kielce, Polska
  • Telephone: (041)34.45.425; 34.43.071
  • Fax: 34.15.656

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
28 December 1882ErectedDiocese of Kielce (erected)
28 October 1925Territory LostDiocese of Kielce
Diocese of Łódź
Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)
Diocese of Częstochowa (erected)
25 March 1992Territory LostDiocese of Częstochowa
Diocese of Kielce
Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}
Diocese of Sosnowiec (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950840,000842,00099.8%369233922,14225428241ap1951
1970897,860920,40097.6%525545791,55079518247ap1971
1980933,9731,000,00093.4%557596161,51678535258ap1981
1990969,993974,78399.5%614666801,42691522321ap1991
1999815,000840,00097.0%598736711,21489397297ap2000
2000810,000820,00098.8%603506531,24062386297ap2001
2001793,239817,58797.0%610506601,20163382300ap2002
2002767,604792,99396.8%622606821,12584402300ap2003
2003768,525788,82497.4%627606871,11887417300ap2004
2004761,510785,24897.0%627606871,10884404300ap2005
2006774,142796,24697.2%658607181,07888411303ap2007
2013768,743813,52594.5%669607291,05485352303ap2014
2016769,000805,14795.5%657607171,07276313304ap2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.5, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Nov 2018

Quantcast