Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Ernst Karl Förster

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1799Born
17 Apr 182525.3Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
19 May 185353.4SelectedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
12 Sep 185353.8ConfirmedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
18 Oct 185353.9Ordained BishopBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
20 Oct 188181.9DiedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Ernst Karl Förster (VIAF: 15566078)
Bishop Heinrich Ernst Karl Förster (born , died ) Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGross-Glogau
Ordained BishopBreslau, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 595
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jan 2017