Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Józef Feliks Gawlina

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Poland, Military

Titular Archbishop of Madytus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1892Born
19 Jun 192128.5Ordained PriestPriest of Katowice, Poland
15 Feb 193340.2AppointedBishop of Poland, Military
15 Feb 193340.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Mariamme
19 Mar 193340.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mariamme
9 Apr 193340.3InstalledBishop of Poland, Military
194754.1ResignedBishop of Poland, Military
29 Nov 195260.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Madytus
21 Sep 196471.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Poland, Military

MicroData Summary for Józef Feliks Gawlina
Archbishop Józef Feliks Gawlina (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Poland, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStrzybnik
Ordained BishopKrólewskiej Hucie
Death PlaceRzymie

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1933, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast