Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wincenty Urban

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland

Titular Bishop of Abitinae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1911Born
28 Jun 193625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv, Ukraine
21 Oct 195948.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
21 Oct 195948.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Abitinae
7 Feb 196048.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abitinae
28 Jun 197261.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
13 Dec 198372.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Wincenty Urban
Bishop Wincenty Urban (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrodzisko Dolne

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1960, Number 6
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 10 Jan 2021

Quantcast