Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Ignaz Müntzer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Titular Bishop of Madaurus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1659³Born
12 Jun 168323.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
18 Mar 168424.5Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
3 Oct 170849.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
3 Oct 170849.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Madaurus
20 Jan 170949.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Madaurus
11 Jan 171454.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anton Ignaz Müntzer
Bishop Anton Ignaz Müntzer (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOberglogau

  • a priest for 29.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1709, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 252

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast