Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastian Ignaz von Rostock

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1607Born
26 Mar 163325.5Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
24 Apr 166456.6SelectedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
12 Jan 166557.3ConfirmedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
12 Apr 166557.6Ordained BishopBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
9 Jun 167163.7DiedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Sebastian Ignaz von Rostock
Bishop Sebastian Ignaz von Rostock (born , died ) Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrottkau

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 373, and Page 382
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1665, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast