Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerhard Schaffran

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dresden-Meißen (Meissen)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1912BornLeschnitz
1 Aug 193725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
24 Nov 196250.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Görlitz, Germany
24 Nov 196250.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Semnea
22 Jan 196350.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Semnea
12 Sep 197058.2AppointedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
23 Sep 197058.2InstalledBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
1 Aug 198775.1RetiredBishop of Dresden-Meißen (Meissen), Germany
4 Mar 199683.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Dresden-Meißen (Meissen), Germany

MicroData Summary for Gerhard Schaffran:
Bishop Gerhard Schaffran (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dresden-Meißen (Meissen)

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 11 Oct 2013