Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}

Archidioecesis Pragensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Dominik Jaroslav Duka, O.P., Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Karel Herbst, S.D.B., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Václav Malý, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Miloslav Vlk, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 30 April 1344
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Czech Republic
  • Square Kilometers: 8,990 (3,472 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.apha.cz/
  • Mailing Address: Hradcanske nam. 16, 119 02 Praha 1, Ceska Republika
  • Telephone: (02)20.39.21.23
  • Fax: 20.51.46.47

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Praha
973ErectedDiocese of Regensburg Diocese of Praha (erected)
1063Territory LostDiocese of Praha Diocese of Olomouc (Olmütz) (erected)
30 April 1344Territory LostDiocese of Praha Diocese of Litomyšl (erected)
Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}
30 April 1344ElevatedDiocese of Praha Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}
1474Territory AddedDiocese of Litomyšl (suppressed) Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}
3 July 1655Territory LostArchdiocese of Praha {Prague} Diocese of Litoměřice (erected)
10 November 1664Territory LostArchdiocese of Praha {Prague} Diocese of Hradec Králové (erected)
20 September 1785Territory LostArchdiocese of Praha {Prague} Diocese of České Budĕjovice {Budweis} (erected)
31 May 1993Territory LostDiocese of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}
Diocese of Litoměřice
Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}
Diocese of Plzeň (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}
19492,052,1542,943,86869.7%6073149212,2283481,710604ap1951
19701,600,0002,620,00061.1%595927,11859486835ap1971
19801,365,0002,740,00049.8%329974263,20497381579ap1981
19901,190,0002,810,00042.3%261663273,63966169579ap1991
1999604,0002,144,00028.2%1601332932,06114228366380ap2000
2000600,0002,140,00028.0%1931523451,73917238311379ap2001
2001604,5002,140,00028.2%1831553381,78817228292376ap2002
2002604,5002,144,00028.2%1911483391,78318224328378ap2003
2003485,6142,062,18923.5%2161613771,28820227284378ap2004
2004488,0002,069,58523.6%2011753761,29721245328378ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 1 Mar 2014