Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leopold Pelldram

Deceased

Bishop of Trier, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1811Born
29 Mar 183523.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
5 Apr 183523.9Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
29 Dec 186453.6SelectedBishop of Trier, Germany
27 Mar 186553.8ConfirmedBishop of Trier, Germany
28 May 186554.0Ordained BishopBishop of Trier, Germany
3 May 186756.0DiedBishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Leopold Pelldram (VIAF: 59826736)
Bishop Leopold Pelldram (born , died ) Bishop of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchweidnitz
Ordained BishopBreslau, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

  • a priest for 32.0 years
  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 564
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Feb 2017