Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Marzinkowski, C.S.Sp.

Bishop Emeritus of Alindao, Central African Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1939 Born
196121.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
21 Jul 196627.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
18 Dec 200465.7AppointedBishop of Alindao, Central African Republic
3 Apr 200566.0Ordained BishopBishop of Alindao, Central African Republic
19 Mar 201475.0RetiredBishop of Alindao, Central African Republic

MicroData Summary for Peter Marzinkowski
Bishop Peter Marzinkowski C.S.Sp. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Alindao

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeipzig, Germany

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Alindao.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 179, Number 14,847
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast