Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maximilian Josef Johannes Kaller

Deceased

Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

Apostolic Administrator of Klaipeda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1880BornBeuthen
20 Jun 190322.7Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
23 Jul 193049.8AppointedPrelate of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
2 Sep 193049.9ConfirmedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
28 Oct 193050.0Ordained BishopBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
18 Nov 193050.1InstalledBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
10 Jun 193958.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Klaipeda, Lithuania
7 Jul 194766.7DiedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

MicroData Summary for Maximilian Josef Johannes Kaller:
Bishop Maximilian Josef Johannes Kaller (born , died ) Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941, Page 532, and Page 294
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013