Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Waclaw Wycisk

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland

Titular Bishop of Caesarea in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1912Born
2 Aug 193624.4Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 195846.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
16 Nov 195846.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Numidia
25 Jan 195946.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Numidia
22 Mar 198472.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Waclaw Wycisk
Bishop Waclaw Wycisk (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlbrachcice

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast