Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Karl von Schuberth

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

Titular Bishop of Canatha


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1779BornNeisse
20 Jun 180223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
30 Sep 183152.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
30 Sep 183152.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Canatha
18 Dec 183152.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canatha
12 Aug 183556.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Joseph Karl von Schuberth:
Bishop Joseph Karl von Schuberth (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 33.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013