Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Osnabrück

Dioecesis Osnabrugensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Franz-Josef Hermann Bode, Bishop
  • Johannes Wübbe, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Theodor Kettmann, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 772
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Hamburg
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Germany
  • Square Kilometers: 12,580 (4,859 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.bistum-osnabrueck.de/
  • Mailing Address: Hasestrasse 40/A, D-49074 Osnabruck, Bundesrepublik Deutschland
  • Telephone: (0541)318.0
  • Fax: 318.117

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
772ErectedDiocese of Osnabrück (erected)
16 August 1821Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of Nordic Missions Diocese of Osnabrück
13 August 1930Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of North German Missions {Germania Settentrionale} (suppressed) Diocese of Osnabrück
23 July 1973Territory LostDiocese of Osnabrück Apostolic Administration of Schwerin (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1949910,0436,820,72313.3%689207091,2831172,345410ap1951
1969897,2627,424,74012.1%7371829199762602,591419ap1971
1980890,6276,600,80013.5%5822057871,131272672,011367ap1981
1990879,7595,915,04914.9%5281706981,260512271,635372ap1991
1999584,2702,053,12928.5%332774091,428451011,023255ap2000
2000581,5992,098,99427.7%326764021,446491021,056255ap2001
2001581,0012,106,92127.6%333643971,46351911,051255ap2002
2002582,5422,106,92127.6%336804161,40050801,051255ap2003
2003582,1832,106,92127.6%328713991,4595590951256ap2004
2004580,6152,106,92127.6%320723921,4815591965256ap2005
2013569,4002,150,00026.5%294473411,6698479777227ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.0.8, 2 May 2015; Data: 4 May 2015