Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Ferche

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Vina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1888Born
22 Jun 191123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
16 Aug 194052.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
16 Aug 194052.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Vina
29 Sep 194052.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vina
27 Mar 194758.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
23 Sep 196577.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Ferche
Bishop Joseph Ferche (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlacePschow

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast