Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Janiak

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kalisz, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1952Born
19 May 197926.7Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
26 Oct 199644.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
26 Oct 199644.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Scilium
30 Nov 199644.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scilium
21 Jul 201259.9AppointedBishop of Kalisz, Poland
12 Sep 201260.0InstalledBishop of Kalisz, Poland
17 Oct 202068.1ResignedBishop of Kalisz, Poland
23 Sep 202169.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Kalisz, Poland

MicroData Summary for Edward Janiak (VIAF: 199626415)
Bishop Edward Janiak (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kalisz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMalczyce
Ordained BishopSaint Jean Baptiste, Cathedral, Wrocław, Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia}
Death PlaceWrocław, Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia}

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,868
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Jul 2012
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2020
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 23 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Sep 2021

Quantcast