Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Leo Cardinal Scheffczyk

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Francesco Saverio alla Garbatella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1920BornBeuthen
29 Jun 194727.3Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
1 Jan 199978.8IncardinatedPriest of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
21 Feb 200181.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Francesco Saverio alla Garbatella
21 Feb 200181.0Elevated to Cardinal
27 May 200181.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Francesco Saverio alla Garbatella
8 Dec 200585.7DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Francesco Saverio alla Garbatella

MicroData Summary for Leo Scheffczyk:
Leo Cardinal Scheffczyk (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Francesco Saverio alla Garbatella

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a cardinal for 4.7 years

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015