Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Nowak

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Oct 1447AppointedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
22 Oct 1447Ordained BishopBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
6 Feb 1456DiedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Piotr Nowak:
Bishop Piotr Nowak (died ) Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,405
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 270
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,765

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013