Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Theissing

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Schwerin

Titular Bishop of Mina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1917BornNeisse
21 Dec 194023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
13 Mar 196345.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Berlin, Germany
13 Mar 196345.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mina
7 May 196345.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mina
12 Feb 197052.2AppointedCoadjutor Apostolic Administrator of Schwerin, Germany
23 Jul 197355.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Schwerin, Germany
5 Dec 198770.0ResignedApostolic Administrator of Schwerin, Germany
11 Nov 198870.9DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Schwerin, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Theissing:
Bishop Heinrich Theissing (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Schwerin

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013